Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CHEVIOTS

Charity number: 268841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 978 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required