Financial history FRIENDS OF CHEVIOTS

Charity number: 268841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.05k £1.46k £32.90k £2.09k £300
Total expenditure £3.30k £1.85k £2.18k £2.18k £763
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A