THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS & MINING

Charity number: 269275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.54m £4.16m £4.01m £4.31m £3.46m
Total expenditure £4.53m £4.74m £6.88m £4.90m £3.80m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £47.36k N/A £44.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £12.00k £0 £13.00k £90.00k
Income - Other trading activities £180.00k £309.00k £227.00k £249.00k £276.00k
Income - Charitable activities £3.08m £3.55m £3.48m £3.75m £2.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £285.00k £295.00k £302.00k £295.00k £259.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.37m £4.45m £6.65m £4.65m £3.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £161.00k £289.00k £227.00k £251.00k £172.00k
Expenditure - Governance £140.00k £148.00k £150.00k £163.00k £19.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £36.25k
Expenditure - Investment management £6.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £6.00k £0 £0 £0 £0