THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS & MINING

Charity number: 269275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Seath Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Prof MR Jolly Trustee 09 March 2016 None on record
Dr Kate Thornton Trustee 11 March 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR SERENA MICHELLE BEST Chair None on record
Dr Michael Raymond Clinch Trustee 12 November 2013 None on record
DR PHILIP JOHN ERWIN BISCHLER Trustee None on record
Neil Edward Glover Trustee 01 January 2018
THE SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH MIDLANDS INSTITUTE OF MINING ENGINEERS Received: On time
Christine Anne Blackmore Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
Martyn Anthony Jones Trustee 21 February 2020 None on record
CHRIS CORTI Trustee
THE SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH MIDLANDS INSTITUTE OF MINING ENGINEERS Received: On time
JAN CHARLES HUGH LEWIS Trustee 05 November 2019
IOM COMMUNICATIONS LTD Received: On time
Vikas Mawkin Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record