Financial history THE HAMPSHIRE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 269378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.13k £6.03k £4.08k £2.43k £1.05k
Total expenditure £9.52k £9.38k £10.30k £8.60k £5.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A