Accounts and annual returns MILLFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 269754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window