Financial history WHEATHAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 269899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £14.56k £18.39k £17.91k £29.23k £16.12k
Total expenditure £9.35k £12.94k £9.63k £18.85k £14.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £660 N/A £673 N/A N/A