HENDON AND DISTRICT ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 269949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.89k £28.36k £29.53k £29.53k £24.21k
Total expenditure £27.63k £31.12k £29.38k £29.38k £25.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A