CALMORE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 270240
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On time Download