CALMORE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 270240
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £50.21k £47.98k £50.54k £46.08k £44.40k
Total expenditure £51.55k £50.65k £44.77k £50.52k £48.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £1.00k £1.25k £1.20k