Financial history OXFORD LITERARY AND DEBATING UNION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 270292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £68.97k £50.83k £88.11k £78.85k £54.46k
Total expenditure £37.12k £38.42k £41.56k £35.31k £26.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A