Trustees OXFORD LITERARY AND DEBATING UNION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 270292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Gideon Frank Aurele Xavier Soskin Trustee 15 January 2022
None on record
Nicholas Jack Mason Trustee 12 January 2019
None on record
Helen Katherine Lucy Whittow QC Trustee 12 January 2019
None on record
The Very Revd Martyn William Percy Trustee 18 June 2016
LI TIM OI FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Neil Mahapatra Trustee 18 June 2016
None on record
The Hon Jacob William Rees-Mogg MP Trustee 31 March 2014
THE MITSUBISHI UFJ TRUST OXFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRASER CAMPBELL MA Trustee 22 April 2011
None on record
VICTORIA SCHOFIELD MA Trustee
None on record