Accounts and annual returns THE MARY HATCH ALMSHOUSES WITH DIAMOND JUBILEE COTTAGES

Charity number: 270372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 20 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window