Financial history THE MARY HATCH ALMSHOUSES WITH DIAMOND JUBILEE COTTAGES

Charity number: 270372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £29.34k £26.68k £32.94k £33.14k £33.17k
Total expenditure £19.98k £41.12k £24.30k £17.99k £15.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A