WHIMPLE/BROADCLYST YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 271103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £49.03k £42.55k £36.01k £32.23k £6.67k
Total expenditure £45.64k £36.31k £31.83k £25.50k £8.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A