Financial history FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL TRUST

Charity number: 271151
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £51.27k £44.47k £398.75k £139.35k £77.46k
Total expenditure £91.10k £122.70k £134.64k £207.90k £139.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £22.85k £17.76k