Z V M RANGOONWALA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 271513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 June 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 08 June 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 26 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On time Download