Z V M RANGOONWALA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 271513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £510.00k £800.00k £995.00k £1.24m £1.29m
Total expenditure £578.38k £799.29k £975.22k £1.20m £1.17m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £800.00k £995.00k £1.24m £1.29m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £510.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £578.38k £732.15k £975.22k £1.20m £1.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £67.14k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £48.48k £3.00k £1.80k £3.50k £3.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £529.90k £0 £911.01k £1.12m £1.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0