THE SELWYN-LLOYD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £4.60k £4.55k £4.14k £3.23k £2.91k
Total expenditure £2.00k £26.60k £26.60k £27.00k £3.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A