Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF CARDIFF CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 271840
Charity reporting is overdue by 46 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 46 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 46 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 June 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required