Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF CARDIFF CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 271840
Charity reporting is overdue by 56 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £5.32k £15.48k £13.69k £8.86k £11.31k
Total expenditure £4.87k £23.18k £13.53k £7.51k £11.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A