ROTARY CLUB OF FELIXSTOWE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £46.60k £51.36k £65.44k £59.24k £32.60k
Total expenditure £41.32k £51.24k £64.00k £60.52k £31.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.00k N/A N/A