Accounts and annual returns SHILTON OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272023
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required