Financial history SHILTON OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 272023
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.37k £8.15k £6.49k £11.89k £11.94k
Total expenditure £14.03k £6.53k £5.52k £2.62k £3.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £3.20k