Trustees TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (NORWICH)
Charity number: 272024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Grierson | Chair | 27 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sayers | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Erika Narkiewicz | Trustee | 02 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Vincent | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Harris | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Baccus | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CERIDWEN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.