Financial history MERTON TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.21k £4.34k £4.64k £4.00k £4.00k
Total expenditure £8.50k £7.92k £8.36k £7.77k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A