Trustees MERTON TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES LUCAS Chair 01 February 2013
None on record
Benjamin Roles Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Frances Elizabeth Henshall Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Adrian Francis Patrick Barnes Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
Ian Johnson Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
DENIS MCGRATH Trustee 02 February 2012
None on record
ROY BENJAMIN Trustee 22 July 2011
MERTON CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING
Received: On time