CLACTON MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 272240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Beadle Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Nicola Heap Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
MR SAM MCCARTHY Chair None on record
Sarah Kamara Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Ashlea Moore Secretary Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Ray Sharp Trustee 12 January 2020 None on record
Roger Ashton Trustee 12 January 2020 None on record
MRS JULIA CLARKE Trustee 17 October 2011 None on record