THE BRITISH REGION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ECUMENICAL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 272271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.43k £22.66k £10.05k £17.16k £3.58k
Total expenditure £29.33k £26.20k £11.77k £21.18k £2.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A