THE MONTEVERDI CHOIR AND ORCHESTRAS LIMITED

Charity number: 272279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.20m £5.04m £4.08m £2.44m £2.56m
Total expenditure £2.79m £4.29m £3.83m £2.70m £2.38m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £77.54k
Income - Donations and legacies £826.49k £1.72m £791.25k £573.58k £814.66k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £3.26m £2.93m £1.64m £1.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £186 £135 £936 £5.64k £2.22k
Income - Other £0 £66.56k £361.43k £219.33k £185.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £200.34k £0 £100.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.70m £4.18m £3.73m £2.63m £2.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £89.86k £111.54k £96.84k £67.23k £75.13k
Expenditure - Governance £10.18k £10.86k £10.50k £10.44k £10.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0