THE OAKS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 272377
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £17.59k £11.11k £8.72k £4.96k £1.35k
Total expenditure £11.88k £12.99k £12.83k £9.01k £920