IMMANUEL YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 272388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £184 £250 £89 £57 £0
Total expenditure £912 £1.04k £754 £224 £157
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A