Trustees ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Charity number: 272565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sami Mirza | Chair | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Joanna Jarjue | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Damian Low | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jason Paul Vit | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr James McAtear | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Daniel Brown | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Andrew Cumiskey | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Frances Deirdre Richardson | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Simren Priestley | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stephen William Spencer Norton | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Julia Ward | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.