Financial history ASHFOLD SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 272663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £3.73m £4.05m £3.91m £3.64m £3.66m
Total expenditure £3.66m £4.01m £3.99m £3.86m £3.93m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £79.90k £49.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.08k £18.44k £7.99k £8.00k £61.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £70.16k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.73m £3.83m £3.90m £3.55m £3.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.03k £1.06k £1.60k £1.55k £0
Income - Other £0 £134.24k £0 £79.90k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.65m £4.01m £3.99m £3.86m £3.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £2.20k £1.84k £2.16k £2.19k
Expenditure - Governance £15.44k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.42k £0 £0 £0 £0