THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST GILDA'S

Charity number: 273048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 December 2019 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 15 December 2019 138 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download