MONTPELIER PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273132
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £39.43k £48.78k £39.21k £46.47k £54.00k
Total expenditure £47.85k £35.96k £41.34k £25.94k £48.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A