Accounts and annual returns MISSION MEDIC-AIR TRUST FUND FOR MISSION MEDIC-AIR LIMITED

Charity number: 273239
Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 193 days
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 193 days
Annual return 02 February 2022 17 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2020 30 January 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2019 11 March 2020 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2019 Not Required