Financial history MISSION MEDIC-AIR TRUST FUND FOR MISSION MEDIC-AIR LIMITED

Charity number: 273239
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/02/2018 02/02/2019 02/02/2020 02/02/2021 02/02/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.70k £3.00k £150 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A