CHICHESTER AREA TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 273279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required