RIVERSIDE PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273427
Charity reporting is overdue by 156 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £6.11k £4.94k £25.07k £6.17k £5.70k
Total expenditure £2.76k £4.19k £7.51k £1.36k £22.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A