Financial history CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNAFFILIATED CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES

Charity number: 273854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £97.14k £96.57k £157.48k £111.47k £92.59k
Total expenditure £108.50k £121.61k £91.41k £100.35k £98.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A