Trustees CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNAFFILIATED CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES

Charity number: 273854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Perry Chair 01 November 2018
None on record
James Andrew Lyon Trustee 01 January 2022
THE CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION LIMITED
Received: On time
CONGREGATIONAL FEDERATION
Received: On time
Rev James Morris Devenish Trustee 17 November 2021
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Clive William Davies Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Rev GWYNNE Martin EVANS Trustee 01 November 2018
THE BIBLE PREACHING TRUST
Received: On time
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
LONDON SEMINARY
Received: On time
THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Mike Valentine Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
David Mark Tucker Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record
Dr DIGBY LAWSON JAMES Trustee
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
WESTON RHYN FREE CHURCHES BURIAL GROUND
Received: On time
REVD C J DAMP Trustee
CHRISTIAN REBUILD
Received: On time