MYERS MARLOW BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 273985
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 March 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 22 March 2021 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 March 2021 776 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required