MYERS MARLOW BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 273985
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £13.64k £14.37k £13.92k £14.65k £16.04k
Total expenditure £10.84k £8.89k £13.54k £14.37k £9.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A