THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.82m £5.93m £21.25m £9.73m £9.29m
Total expenditure £5.99m £6.25m £7.04m £8.19m £10.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.43m £2.38m £16.97m £4.17m £5.78m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £1.34m £215.02k £14.43m £2.81m £3.18m
Income - Investment £4.39m £3.55m £4.28m £5.49m £3.48m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £65.69k £28.66k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.77m £6.05m £6.85m £7.99m £9.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £222.90k £198.06k £188.70k £197.91k £154.59k
Expenditure - Governance £15.90k £16.76k £9.63k £13.63k £25.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.23m £5.51m £6.28m £7.36m £9.20m
Expenditure - Investment management £222.90k £198.06k £188.70k £197.91k £154.59k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0