THE CLOTHWORKERS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DHRUV PRASHANT PATEL Trustee 30 June 2021
CLOCKWORK FOUNDATION Received: On time
Philip Francis Portal Trustee 31 August 2019 None on record
HANIF VIRJI Trustee 13 July 2016 None on record
Neel Purshottam Patani Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
OONAGH SMYTH Trustee 12 February 2021 None on record
Dr Lucy Rawson Trustee 17 July 2014 None on record
CHLOE MARIE HOLNESS Trustee 12 February 2021 None on record
Emma Alexandra Ingham Clark Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Andrew Charles Blessley Trustee 15 July 2015
HOLLY LODGE CENTRE Received: On time
THE SOUTH SQUARE TRUST Received: On time
Charles John Alan Hutchins Trustee 31 August 2019 None on record
MICHAEL WILLIAM JARVIS FCA Chair None on record
THOMAS RICHARD MALCOLM STODDART-SCOTT Trustee 31 August 2019
Harrow Club Received: On time
OLA OPOOSUN Trustee 12 February 2021 None on record
SUSANNA PRIESTLEY O'LEARY Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
Denis Henry Clough Trustee 31 August 2019
THE SAINT MARY'S CHURCH, BRAUGHING RESTORATION TRUST Received: On time
THE KILROOT FOUNDATION Received: On time