Financial history FRINTON-ON-SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £132.16k £97.95k £109.21k £97.01k £74.10k
Total expenditure £150.68k £90.09k £103.26k £106.55k £90.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.69k £0 N/A N/A £29.15k