ST LUKE'S SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.20k £7.50k £5.26k £6.93k £6.00k
Total expenditure £2.99k £8.77k £1.02k £5.81k £3.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A