Trustees ACTIONAID
Charity number: 274467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faraz Tasnim | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Stella Eze Ngozi Abani | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Amina Folarin | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rajiv Vyas | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Fikerte Woldegiorgis Atreso | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Catherine Tutt | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Abdulrahman Shiil | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sophie Healy Thow | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.