Financial history BAGSHOT PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £21.45k £17.05k £48.76k £22.76k £154.44k
Total expenditure £21.73k £22.93k £54.95k £18.30k £170.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £2.00k £8.00k £500 £25.96k